No. 23A1035
Title:Dedric Dixon, Applicant
v.
Bobby Lumpkin, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:May 21, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-50800)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 03 2024Application (23A1035) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 24, 2024 to August 8, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
May 22 2024Application (23A1035) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until August 8, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Dedric Dixon
    Counsel of Record
TDCJ #2179208
Polunsky Unit
3872 FM 350 South
Livingston, TX 77351

Party name: Dedric Dixon