No. 23A1034
Title:John Paul Salvador, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:May 21, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-60008)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 17 2024Application (23A1034) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 30, 2024 to July 29, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 21 2024Application (23A1034) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 29, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Timothy Tutt
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

ANDREW.TUTT@ARNOLDPORTER.COM
202-942-5000
Party name: John Paul Salvador
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States