No. 23A1029
Title:Mark Randall Meadows, Applicant
v.
Georgia
Docketed:May 20, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-12958)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 16 2024Application (23A1029) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 28, 2024 to June 27, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 21 2024Application (23A1029) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until June 27, 2024.
Jun 14 2024Application (23A1029) to extend further the time from June 27, 2024 to July 27, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Written RequestProof of Service
Jun 20 2024Application (23A1029) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until July 27, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
706 Duke Street
Alexandria, VA 22314

PAUL.CLEMENT@CLEMENTMURPHY.COM
(202) 742-8900
Party name: Mark Randall Meadows
Attorneys for Respondent
Francis McDonald Wakeford IV
    Counsel of Record
Fulton County District Attorney's Office
136 Pryor Street SW
Atlanta, GA 30303

fmcdonald.wakeford@fultoncountyga.gov
(404) 612-3253
Party name: Georgia