No. 23A1028
Title:Kalamice Keson Piggee, Applicant
v.
Gena Jones, Warden
Docketed:May 20, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(No. 22-55770)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 16 2024Application (23A1028) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 26, 2024 to July 25, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 20 2024Application (23A1028) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 25, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Devon Lashae Hein
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
321 E 2nd St
Los Angeles, CA 90012

Devon_Hein@fd.org
(213) 894-2936
Party name: Kalamice Piggee