No. 23A1025
Title:Vivendi S.E., et al., Applicants
v.
EPAC Technologies Ltd.
Docketed:May 17, 2024
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of New York
   Case Numbers:(2023-843)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 15 2024Application (23A1025) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 24, 2024 to September 22, 2024, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 22 2024Application (23A1025) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until September 23, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Vincent Gregory Levy
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg, LLP
425 Lexington Avenue
14th Floor
New York, NY 10017

VLEVY@HSGLLP.COM
6468375120
Party name: Bolloré S.E., et al.