No. 23A1024
Title:Roy Sargeant, Applicant
v.
Aracelie Barfield
Docketed:May 17, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2287)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 15 2024Application (23A1024) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 17, 2024 to August 16, 2024, submitted to Justice Barrett.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 17 2024Application (23A1024) granted by Justice Barrett extending the time to file until August 16, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Timothy Tutt
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

ANDREW.TUTT@ARNOLDPORTER.COM
202-942-5000
Party name: Roy Sargeant