No. 23A1023
Title:Marques A. Johnson, Applicant
v.
Chris Nocco, in His Official Capacity as Sheriff of Pasco County, Florida, et al.
Docketed:May 17, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-10670)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 14 2024Application (23A1023) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 14, 2024 to September 12, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions
May 20 2024Application (23A1023) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until August 13, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ryan David Barack
    Counsel of Record
Kwall Barack Nadeau PLLC
304 S Belcher Rd.
Suite C
Clearwater, FL 33765

Rbarack@employeerights.com
7274414947
Party name: Marques A. Johnson