No. 23A1022
Title:Ahmed Alahmedalabdaloklah, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:May 17, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-10435)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 15 2024Application (23A1022) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 2, 2024 to August 1, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 19 2024Application (23A1022) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 1, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Molly Alana Karlin
    Counsel of Record
850 West Adams Street, Suite 201
Phoenix, AZ 85007

molly_karlin@fd.org
(602)382-2741
Party name: Ahmed Alahmedalabdaloklah
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States