No. 23A1018
Title:Luis Marin, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:May 16, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-50154, 22-50155)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 13 2024Application (23A1018) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 26, 2024 to July 25, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 16 2024Application (23A1018) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 25, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kenneth J. Troiano
    Counsel of Record
P.O. Box 33536
San Diego, CA 92163-3536

kjtroiano@mac.com
(858) 268-8600
Party name: Luis Marin
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America