No. 23A1015
Title:Christina Brown, Applicant
v.
Amazon Headquarters, LLC, et al.
Docketed:May 15, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-1921)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 13 2024Application (23A1015) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 3, 2024 to July 3, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
May 16 2024Application (23A1015) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 3, 2024.
Jun 17 2024Application (23A1015) to extend further the time from July 3, 2024 to August 2, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Written Request
Jun 20 2024Application (23A1015) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 2, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Christina Brown
    Counsel of Record
5740 North Carlin Springs Road
Arlington, VA 22203

Party name: Christina Brown