No. 23A1013
Title:Jean Coulter, Applicant
v.
James P. Coulter, et al.
Docketed:May 15, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-2222)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 13 2024Application (23A1013) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 28, 2024 to July 27, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
May 16 2024Application (23A1013) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until July 27, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jean Coulter
    Counsel of Record
620 Butler Crossing #3
PMB 172
Butler, PA 16001

(412) 616-9505
Party name: Jean Coulter