No. 23A1012
Title:Brent Evan Webster, Applicant
v.
United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Oregon
Docketed:May 14, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-2647)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 29 2024Application (23A1012) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 29, 2024 to July 28, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 14 2024Application (23A1012) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 28, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brent Evan Webster8701 SE Cottrell Rd.
Boring, OR 97009

Party name: Brent Evan Webster