No. 23A1010
Title:Xanadu Corp, et al., Applicants
v.
Meor Adlin, et al.
Docketed:May 14, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-15118)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 10 2024Application (23A1010) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 27, 2024 to July 26, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 14 2024Application (23A1010) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 26, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John Allen Roth
    Counsel of Record
805 S Alexandria Street
Latrobe, PA 15650

office@jarothlaw.com
7246868003
Party name: Xanadu Corp, et al.