No. 23A1009
Title:Luis Chavez, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:May 14, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-50155)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 10 2024Application (23A1009) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 26, 2024 to July 25, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 15 2024Application (23A1009) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 25, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Martin Gerardo Molina
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Marti G. Molina
185 West F Street
Suite 100
San Dieago, CA 92101

mmolinaesq@outlook.com
619-232-0620
Party name: Luis Chavez
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States