No. 23A1008
Title:Darryl Watts, Applicant
v.
New York
Docketed:May 13, 2024
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of New York
   Case Numbers:(No. 10)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 09 2024Application (23A1008) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 22, 2024 to July 21, 2024, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main Document
May 14 2024Application (23A1008) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until July 22, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lawrence T. Hausman
    Counsel of Record
The Legal Aid Society
199 Water Street
New York, NY 10038

thausman@legal-aid.org
646-584-5885
Party name: Darryl Watts