No. 23A1006
Title:Marcus Jarrod Payne, Applicant
v.
The Anthony Scott Law Firm, P.L.L.C., et al.
Docketed:May 10, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-10517)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 15 2024Application (23A1006) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 6, 2024 to June 20, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
May 13 2024Application (23A1006) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until June 20, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Marcus Jarrod Payne
    Counsel of Record
1667 W. Campbell Rd.
#5418
Garland, TX 75044

(214) 952-7114
Party name: Marcus Jarrod Payne