No. 23A1005
Title:Eric Cruz, Applicant
v.
Officer Cervantez
Docketed:May 10, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-10483)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 01 2024Application (23A1005) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 22, 2024 to September 20, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
May 14 2024Application (23A1005) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until September 20, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric Cruz
    Counsel of Record
TDCJ #02059509
Huntsville Unit
815 12th St.
Huntsville, TX 77348

Party name: Eric Cruz