No. 23A1004
Title:Lemon Bay Cove, LLC, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:May 10, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-2242)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 07 2024Application (23A1004) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 4, 2024 to July 9, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
May 13 2024Application (23A1004) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 9, 2024.
Jun 21 2024Application (23A1004) to extend further the time from July 9, 2024 to August 2, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Written Request
Jun 26 2024Application (23A1004) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 2, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Christopher Matthew Kieser
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
555 Capitol Mall, Suite 1290
Sacramento, CA 95814

ckieser@pacificlegal.org
9165039059
Party name: Lemon Bay Cove, LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States