No. 23A1001
Title:Amadi Sosa, Applicant
v.
Massachusetts
Docketed:May 9, 2024
Lower Ct:Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts
   Case Numbers:(SJC-12166)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 02 2024Application (23A1001) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 16, 2024 to July 15, 2024, submitted to Justice Jackson.
Main Document
May 09 2024Application (23A1001) granted by Justice Jackson extending the time to file until July 15, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John M. Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Thompson & Thompson, PC
75 Market Street
3rd Floor
Springfield, MA 01103

habeasjohn@ttpclaw.com
413-222-7215
Party name: Amadi Sosa