No. 23-976
Title:Jeremy Henning, Petitioner
v.
Donald V. Snowden
Docketed:March 6, 2024
Linked with 23A679
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1463)
   Decision Date:June 27, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:November 3, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 19 2024Application (23A679) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 1, 2024 to March 4, 2024, submitted to Justice Barrett.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 25 2024Application (23A679) granted by Justice Barrett extending the time to file until March 4, 2024.
Mar 04 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 5, 2024)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2024Waiver of right of respondent Donald V. Snowden to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 04 2024Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 05 2024Brief amicus curiae of Federal Law Enforcement Officers Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 10 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2024.
Apr 16 2024Response Requested. (Due May 16, 2024)
Apr 26 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 16, 2024 to June 17, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. (Docket entry corrected 4/30/24)
Main Document
Apr 30 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 17, 2024.
Jun 17 2024Brief of respondent Donald V. Snowden in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 02 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/30/2024.
Jul 02 2024Reply of petitioner Jeremy Henning filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey Alan Lamken
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 500
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

JLAMKEN@MOLOLAMKEN.COM
2025562010
Party name: Jeremy Henning
Attorneys for Respondent
David Meir Zionts
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burlington LLP
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

dzionts@cov.com
(202) 662-5987
Party name: Donald V. Snowden
Other
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

LJOSEPH@LARRYJOSEPH.COM
2023559452
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund
Debra L. Roth
    Counsel of Record
Shaw Bransford and Roth P.C.
1101 Connecticut Avenue
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20036

droth@shawbransford.com
2024638400
Party name: Federal Law Enforcement Officers Association (FLEOA)