No. 23-975
Title:Seven County Infrastructure Coalition, et al., Petitioners
v.
Eagle County, Colorado, et al.
Docketed:March 6, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1019, 22-1020)
   Decision Date:August 18, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:December 4, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 04 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 5, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 25 2024Motion of the Solicitor General to extend the time to file a response from April 5, 2024 to May 6, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 26 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 6, 2024, for all respondents.
Apr 04 2024Brief amici curiae of Ute Indian Tribe of the Uintah and Ouray Reservation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 05 2024Brief amicus curiae of Utah filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 05 2024Brief amicus curiae of NACCO Natural Resources Corporation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 05 2024Brief amicus curiae of American Forest Resource Council filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 05 2024Brief amici curiae of Utah American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 05 2024Brief amici curiae of Interstate Natural Gas Association of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 05 2024Brief amici curiae of TN Ranching Company, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 10 2024Motion of respondent Eagle County, CO, et al. to extend the time to file a response from May 6, 2024 to June 5, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 12 2024Response to motion to extend the time to file a response from petitioner filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 15 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is further extended to and including May 20, 2024, for all respondents.
May 20 2024Brief of Federal respondents in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 20 2024Brief of respondents Eagle County, Colorado, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 22 2024Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 28 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2024.
May 28 2024Reply of petitioners Seven County Infrastructure Coalition, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2024.
Jun 24 2024Petition GRANTED.
Jul 12 2024Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 18 2024Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 28, 2024. The time to file respondents' briefs on the merits is extended to and including October 18, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jay Christopher Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Venable LLP
600 Massachusetts Ave NW
Washington, DC 20001

jcjohnson@venable.com
2023444000
Party name: Seven County Infrastructure Coalition, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Nathaniel Hemmerick Hunt
    Counsel of Record
Kaplan Kirsch & Rockwell LLP
1675 Broadway, Suite 2300
Denver, CO 80202

nhunt@kaplankirsch.com
3038257000
Party name: Eagle County, Colorado, et al.
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Edward Breckenridge ZukoskiCenter for Biological Diversity
1536 Wynkoop Street, Suite 421
Denver, CO 80202

tzukoski@biologicaldiversity.org
303-641-3149
Party name: Center for Biological Diversity, Living Rivers, Sierra Club, Utah Physicians for a Healthy Environment, and WildEarth Guardians
Other
Karen Budd-Falen
    Counsel of Record
Budd-Falen Law Offices, LLC
300 East 18th Street, Post Office Box 346
Cheyenne, WY 82003-0346

karen@buddfalen.com
(307) 632-5105
Party name: TN Ranching Company, et al.
Ivan Laurence London
    Counsel of Record
Mountain States Legal Foundation
2596 South Lewis Way
Lakewood, CO 80227

ilondon@mslegal.org
3032922021
Party name: American Forest Resource Council
Frank D. Mylar
    Counsel of Record
Mylar Law, P.C.
2494 Bengal Blvd.
Salt Lake City, UT 84121

OFFICE@MYLARLAW.COM
8018580700
Party name: Utah Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations
Stanford Edward Purser
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Utah Attorney General
160 E. 300 S., 5th floor
Salt Lake City, UT 84020

SPURSER@AGUTAH.GOV
385-382-4334
Party name: Utah
Jeffrey Scott Rasmussen
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Earnhart Real Bird & Wilson LLP
1900 Plaza Drive
Louisville, CO 80027

jrasmussen@nativelawgroup.com
303-926-5292
Party name: Western States and Tribal Nations Natural Gas Initiative
Jeffrey Scott Rasmussen
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Earnhart Real Bird & Wilson LLP
1900 Plaza Drive
Louisville, CO 80027

jrasmussen@nativelawgroup.com
303-926-5292
Party name: Ute Indian Tribe of the Uintah and Ouray Reservation
Donald P. Salzman
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20005

donald.salzman@skadden.com
202.371.7983
Party name: Interstate Natural Gas Association of America, et al.
Charles Turner Wehland
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
110 W. Wacker Drive
suite 4800
Chicago, IL 60601-1692

ctwehland@jonesday.com
312-269-4388
Party name: NACCO Natural Resources Corporation