No. 23-942
Title:Sherman Campbell, Warden, Petitioner
v.
Stephen J. Kares
Docketed:February 28, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2845)
   Decision Date:August 8, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:November 28, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 26 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 29, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 15 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 29, 2024 to April 29, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 18 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 29, 2024.
Apr 19 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 29, 2024 to May 29, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 22 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 29, 2024.
May 20 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 29, 2024 to June 28, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 21 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 28, 2024.
Jun 28 2024Brief of respondent Stephen J. Kares in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 10 2024Reply of petitioner Sherman Campbell filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 17 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/30/2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ann Maurine Sherman
    Counsel of Record
Michigan Department of Attorney General
G. Mennen Williams Building
P.O. Box 30212
Lansing, MI 48909

SHERMANA@MICHIGAN.GOV
517-335-7628
Party name: Sherman Campbell
Attorneys for Respondent
Easha Anand
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
501 H St. NE, Suite 275
Washington, DC 20001

easha.anand@macarthurjustice.org
510-588-1274
Party name: Stephen J. Kares