No. 23-94
Vide 23-32
Title:Garret Miller, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 1, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-3041)
   Decision Date:April 7, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:May 23, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 28 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 31, 2023)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 24 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 31, 2023 to October 1, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 28 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 2, 2023.
Aug 30 2023Brief amici curiae of Christopher Warnagiris, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 25 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 2, 2023 to October 30, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 26 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 30, 2023.
Oct 30 2023Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 08 2023Reply of petitioner Garret Miller filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 14 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2023.
Dec 01 2023Rescheduled.
Dec 01 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Benjamin Smith
    Counsel of Record
David B. Smith, PLLC
1123 Broadway, Suite 909
New York, NY 10010

dbs@davidbsmithpllc.com
9179023869
Party name: Garret Miller
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Theodore Mark Cooperstein
    Counsel of Record
Theodore Cooperstein PLLC
1888 Main Street
Suite C-203
Madison, MS 39110

ted@appealslawyer.us
6013972471
Party name: Christopher Warnagiris, Christopher Carnell, William Robert Norwood