No. 23-929
Title:Hugo Abisai Monsalvo Velazquez, Petitioner
v.
Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General
Docketed:February 27, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-9576)
   Decision Date:December 14, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 23 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 28, 2024)
Feb 23 2024Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Mar 20 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 28, 2024 to April 29, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Mar 21 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 29, 2024.
Apr 17 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 29, 2024 to May 15, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Apr 18 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 15, 2024.
May 15 2024Brief of respondent Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General in opposition filed.
Jun 03 2024Reply of petitioner Hugo Abisai Monsalvo Velazquez filed. (Distributed)
Jun 04 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2024.
Jun 28 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2024.
Jul 02 2024Petition GRANTED.
Jul 02 2024As Rule 34.6 provides, “If the Court schedules briefing and oral argument in a case that was governed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c) or Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 49.1(c), the parties shall submit electronic versions of all prior and subsequent filings with this Court in the case, subject to [applicable] redaction rules.” Subsequent party and amicus filings in the case should now be submitted through the Court’s electronic filing system, with any necessary redactions.
Jul 18 2024Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 18 2024Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 22, 2024. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 27, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gerard Justin Cedrone
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
100 Northern Avenue
Boston, MA 02210

gcedrone@goodwinlaw.com
617-570-1849
Party name: Hugo Abisai Monsalvo Velazquez
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Garland, Merrick B.