No. 23-919 | |
Title: | Kristin DiCroce, Petitioner v. McNeil Nutritionals, LLC, et al. |
Docketed: | February 26, 2024 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (22-1910) |
Decision Date: | September 18, 2023 |
Rehearing Denied: | November 29, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Feb 22 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 27, 2024) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 13 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent McNeil Nutritionals, LLC, et al. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Mar 20 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2024. |
Apr 15 2024 | Petition DENIED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
John P. Zavez Counsel of Record | Adkins, Kelston & Zavez, PC 90 Canal Street 4th Floor Boston, MA 02114 jzavez@akzlaw.com | 617-303-3928 |
Party name: Kristin DiCroce | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Hannah Y. S. Chanoine Counsel of Record | O'Melveny and Myers LLP Times Square Tower 7 Times Square New York, NY 10036 hchanoine@omm.com | 2123262000 |
Party name: McNeil Nutritionals, LLC, et al. |