No. 23-916
Title:Franco P. Clement, Petitioner
v.
Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General
Docketed:February 23, 2024
Linked with 23A532
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-13382)
   Decision Date:July 28, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:October 24, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 07 2023Application (23A532) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 22, 2024 to March 22, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Dec 07 2023Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Dec 12 2023Application (23A532) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until February 21, 2024.
Feb 21 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 25, 2024)
Mar 08 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 25, 2024 to April 24, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 12 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 24, 2024.
Apr 10 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 24, 2024 to May 21, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Apr 11 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 21, 2024.
May 21 2024Brief of respondent Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General in opposition filed.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel Martin Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP
425 Lexington Avenue
14th Floor
New York, NY 10017

aindorf@hsgllp.com
(646) 837-5120
Party name: Franco P. Clement
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General