No. 23-909
Title:Stamatios Kousisis and Alpha Painting and Construction Co., Inc., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:February 22, 2024
Linked with 23A538
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-3679, 19-3774)
   Decision Date:September 22, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 08 2023Application (23A538) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 21, 2023 to January 19, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions
Dec 12 2023Application (23A538) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until January 19, 2024.
Jan 04 2024Application (23A538) to extend further the time from January 19, 2024 to February 19, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Written RequestWritten RequestWritten Request
Jan 18 2024Application (23A538) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until February 19, 2024.
Feb 20 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 25, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 25, 2024 to April 24, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 07 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 24, 2024.
Mar 25 2024Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 24 2024Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 10 2024Reply of petitioners Kousisis, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 14 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2024.
May 29 2024Rescheduled.
Jun 03 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2024.
Jun 10 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2024.
Jun 17 2024Petition GRANTED.
Jul 08 2024Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 09 2024Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 19, 2024. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 2, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Lisa Ann Mathewson
    Counsel of Record
Mathewson Law LLC
1617 John F. Kennedy Blvd.
Suite 2027
Philadelphia, PA 19103

lam@mathewson-law.com
215-399-9592
Party name: Kousisis, et al.
Jeffrey L. FisherO'Melveny & Myers LLP
2765 Sand Hill Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025

JLFISHER@OMM.COM
(650) 473-2600
Party name: Kousisis, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Lawrence S. Lustberg
    Counsel of Record
Gibbons P.C.
One Gateway Center
Newark, NJ 07102

llustberg@gibbonslaw.com
(973) 596-4500
Party name: The Cato Institute, Due Process Institute and The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers