No. 23-900
Title:Dewberry Group, Inc., fka Dewberry Capital Corporation, Petitioner
v.
Dewberry Engineers Inc.
Docketed:February 21, 2024
Linked with 23A517
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1622, 22-1845)
   Decision Date:August 9, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:September 19, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 04 2023Application (23A517) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 18, 2023 to February 16, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 11 2023Application (23A517) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 16, 2024.
Feb 16 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 22, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2024Waiver of right of respondent Dewberry Engineers Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 28 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2024.
Mar 07 2024Response Requested. (Due April 8, 2024)
Mar 13 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 8, 2024 to May 8, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 14 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 8, 2024.
Apr 08 2024Brief amici curiae of Professors Samuel L. Bray and Paul B. Miller filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 08 2024Brief of respondent Dewberry Engineers Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountOther
May 28 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2024.
May 28 2024Reply of petitioner Dewberry Group, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 17 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2024.
Jun 24 2024Petition GRANTED.
Jul 15 2024Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 18 2024Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits is granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 30, 2024. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 22, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Helgi C. Walker
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

hwalker@gibsondunn.com
(202) 955-8500
Party name: Dewberry Group, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elbert Lin
    Counsel of Record
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
951 E. Byrd Street
Riverfront Plaza, East Tower
Richmond, VA 23219-4074

ELIN@HUNTONAK.COM
804-788-7202
Party name: Dewberry Engineers Inc.
Other
Donald Burke
    Counsel of Record
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
1875 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006-1238

dburke@willkie.com
202-303-1037
Party name: Professors Samuel L. Bray and Paul B. Miller