No. 23-9 | |
Title: | AstraZeneca UK Limited, et al., Petitioners v. Joshua Atchley, et al. |
Docketed: | July 5, 2023 |
Linked with 22A868 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (20-7077) |
Decision Date: | January 4, 2022 |
Rehearing Denied: | February 2, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Apr 03 2023 | Application (22A868) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 4, 2023 to July 3, 2023, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Apr 06 2023 | Application (22A868) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 2, 2023. |
Jun 30 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 4, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jul 25 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 4, 2023 to August 23, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jul 26 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 23, 2023. |
Aug 04 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Aug 23 2023 | Brief of respondents Joshua Atchley, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Sep 06 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023. |
Sep 06 2023 | Reply of petitioners AstraZeneca UK Limited, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Oct 02 2023 | The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration of this petition. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Lisa Schiavo Blatt Counsel of Record | Williams & Connolly LLP 680 Maine Avenue SW Washington, DC 20024 LBLATT@WC.COM | 202-434-5050 |
Party name: AstraZeneca UK Limited, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Joshua Daniel Branson Counsel of Record | Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C. 1615 M Street NW, Suite 400 Washington, DC 20036 jbranson@kellogghansen.com | 2023267944 |
Party name: Joshua Atchley, et al. | ||
Other | ||
Andrew John Pincus Counsel of Record | Mayer Brown LLP 1999 K Street, NW Washington, DC 20006 APINCUS@MAYERBROWN.COM | 202-263-3000 |
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America |