No. 23-867
Title:Republic of Hungary, et al., Petitioners
v.
Rosalie Simon, et al.
Docketed:February 12, 2024
Linked with 23A592
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-7010, 22-7013, 22-7112)
   Decision Date:August 8, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:October 12, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 21 2023Application (23A592) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 10, 2024 to February 9, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 04 2024Application (23A592) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 9, 2024.
Feb 07 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 13, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 13 2024Waiver of right of respondent Rosalie Simon, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 20 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2024.
Mar 25 2024Response Requested. (Due April 24, 2024)
Apr 18 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 24, 2024 to May 21, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 19 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 21, 2024, for all respondents.
May 14 2024Brief of respondents Rosalie Simon, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
May 24 2024Reply of petitioners Republic of Hungary, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 28 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2024.
Jun 17 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2024.
Jun 24 2024Petition GRANTED.
Jul 11 2024Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 15 2024Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 26, 2024. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including October 11, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Joshua Scott Glasgow
    Counsel of Record
Phillips Lytle LLP
620 Eighth Avenue
38th Floor
New York, NY 10018

jglasgow@phillipslytle.com
2127594888
Party name: Republic of Hungary and Magyar Allamvasutak Zrt
Attorneys for Respondents
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

SHAY.DVORETZKY@SKADDEN.COM
202-371-7370
Party name: Rosalie Simon, Rosanna Weksberg Finkelberg (as heir to Helena Weksberg), Rose Miller & Thomas Schlanger (as heir to Ella Feuerstein Schlanger)
Charles S. FaxRifkin Weiner Livingston LLC
7700 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 320
Bethesda, MD 20814

cfax@rwllaw.com
410-274-1453
Party name: Rosalie Simon, et al.
L. Marc Zell34 Ben Yehuda Street
Jerusalem, XX 9423001

Mzell@fandz.com
01197226336300
Party name: Rosalie Simon, Rosanna Weksberg Finkelberg (as heir to Helena Weksberg), Rose Miller & Thomas Schlanger (as heir to Ella Feuerstein Schlanger)