No. 23-863
Title:Dominic Bianchi, et al., Petitioners
v.
Anthony G. Brown, in His Official Capacity as Attorney General of Maryland, et al.
Docketed:February 12, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1255)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 08 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed. (Response due March 13, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 13, 2024 to April 12, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 07 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 12, 2024.
Mar 13 2024Brief amici curiae of International Law Enforcement Educators & Trainers Assoc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 12 2024Brief of respondents Anthony G. Brown, in his official capacity as Attorney General of Maryland, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David H. Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

DTHOMPSON@COOPERKIRK.COM
202-220-9600
Party name: Dominic Bianchi, an individual and resident of Baltimore County, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Ryan Robert Dietrich
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General of Maryland
200 St. Paul Place
Baltimore, MD 21202

rdietrich@oag.state.md.us
410-576-7648
Party name: Anthony G. Brown, in his official capacity as Attorney General of Maryland, et al.
Other
David Benjamin Kopel
    Counsel of Record
Independence Institute
727 East 16th Avenue
Denver, CO 80203

david@i2i.org
3032796536
Party name: International Law Enforcement Educators & Trainers Assoc., John Locke Foundation, Independence Institute