No. 23-861
Title:Nick Feliciano, Petitioner
v.
Department of Transportation
Docketed:February 12, 2024
Linked with 23A653
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2022-1219)
   Decision Date:May 15, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:October 27, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 11 2024Application (23A653) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 25, 2024 to February 8, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 17 2024Application (23A653) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 8, 2024.
Feb 08 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 13, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 22 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 13, 2024 to April 12, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 23 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 12, 2024.
Feb 26 2024Brief amicus curiae of Military-Veterans Advocacy, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 26 2024Brief amicus curiae of Reserve Organization of America filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 13 2024Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 13 2024Brief amici curiae of Texas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 03 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 12, 2024 to May 10, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 04 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 10, 2024.
May 07 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 10, 2024 to May 13, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 08 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 13, 2024.
May 13 2024Brief of respondent Department of Transportation in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 24 2024Reply of petitioner Nick Feliciano filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 28 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2024.
Jun 17 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2024.
Jun 24 2024Petition GRANTED.
Jul 08 2024Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 09 2024Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 19, 2024. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 27, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Timothy Tutt
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

ANDREW.TUTT@ARNOLDPORTER.COM
202-942-5000
Party name: Nick Feliciano
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of Transportation
Other
Melanie Lynn Bostwick
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
2100 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20037

MBOSTWICK@ORRICK.COM
202-339-8483
Party name: Military-Veterans Advocacy, Inc.
Scott Andrew Felder
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
2050 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

sfelder@wiley.law
(202) 719-7000
Party name: Reserve Organization of America
Aaron Lloyd Nielson
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Texas Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC-059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

aaron.nielson@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Texas, South Carolina, 18 Other States, and the District of Columbia
Daniel Stephen Volchok
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
2100 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20037

DANIEL.VOLCHOK@WILMERHALE.COM
2026636000
Party name: Members of Congress