No. 23-853
Title:Credit Bureau Center, LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Federal Trade Commission
Docketed:February 7, 2024
Linked with 23A699
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2945)
   Decision Date:August 30, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:November 3, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 25 2024Application (23A699) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 1, 2024 to April 1, 2024, submitted to Justice Barrett.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsOther
Jan 29 2024Application (23A699) denied by Justice Barrett.
Feb 01 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 8, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 8, 2024 to April 8, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 29 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 8, 2024.
Mar 26 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 8, 2024 to May 8, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 28 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 8, 2024.
May 08 2024Brief of respondent Federal Trade Commission in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 22 2024Reply of petitioners Credit Bureau Center, LLC, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 28 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Oliver James Dunford
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
4440 PGA Boulevard
Suite 307
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

ODUNFORD@PACIFICLEGAL.ORG
916.503.9060
Party name: Credit Bureau Center, LLC, et al.
Caleb Joseph KruckenbergPacific Legal Foundation
3100 Clarendon Blvd, Suite 1000
Arlington, VA 22201

kruckenberg@cir-usa.org
916-419-7111
Party name: Credit Bureau Center, LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Trade Commission