No. 23-852 | |
Title: | Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, et al., Petitioners v. Jennifer VanDerStok, et al. |
Docketed: | February 7, 2024 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (23-10718) |
Decision Date: | November 9, 2023 |
Questions Presented |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Feb 07 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 8, 2024) |
PetitionAppendixProof of Service | |
Mar 07 2024 | Brief amici curiae of District of Columbia, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 07 2024 | Brief of respondents Jennifer VanDerStok, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 08 2024 | Brief of respondents Defense Distributed, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 08 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of Gun Violence Protection Groups filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 27 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2024. |
Mar 27 2024 | Reply of petitioners Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 15 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/19/2024. |
Apr 22 2024 | Petition GRANTED. |
Apr 29 2024 | Motion for an extension of time filed. |
Main Document | |
Apr 29 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including June 25, 2024. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 13, 2024. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Charles Randall Flores Counsel of Record | Flores Law PLLC 917 Franklin Street Suite 600 Houston, TX 77002 cf@chadflores.law | 713-364-6640 |
Party name: Defense Distributed; Polymer 80, Inc.; Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. | ||
David H. Thompson Counsel of Record | Cooper & Kirk, PLLC 1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W. Washington, DC 20036 DTHOMPSON@COOPERKIRK.COM | 202-220-9600 |
Party name: Jennifer VanDerStok, Michael G. Andren, Tactical Machining, L.L.C., and Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc. | ||
Other | ||
Kathleen Roberta Hartnett Counsel of Record | Cooley LLP 3 Embarcadero Center 20th Floor San Francisco, CA 94111 KHARTNETT@COOLEY.COM | (415) 693-2000 |
Party name: Gun Violence Protection Groups | ||
Caroline Sage Van Zile Counsel of Record | Office of the Attorney General for D.C. Office of the Solicitor General 400 6th Street, NW, Suite 8100 Washington, DC 20001 caroline.vanzile@dc.gov | (202) 724-6609 |
Party name: The District of Columbia, New Jersey, Pennsylvania, et al. |