No. 23-830
Title:Lonnie Allen Bassett, Petitioner
v.
Arizona
Docketed:February 2, 2024
Linked with 23A475
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Arizona
   Case Numbers:(CR-22-0227-PR)
   Decision Date:September 18, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 22 2023Application (23A475) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 17, 2023 to January 31, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 29 2023Application (23A475) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until January 31, 2024.
Jan 31 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 4, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 29 2024Waiver of right of respondent Arizona to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 04 2024Brief amici curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 04 2024Brief amici curiae of 15 Constitutional and Criminal Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 04 2024Brief amicus curiae of Office of the Maricopa County Public Defender filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/22/2024.
Mar 07 2024Response Requested. (Due April 8, 2024)
Mar 15 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 8, 2024 to May 8, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 18 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 8, 2024.
May 08 2024Brief of respondent Arizona in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 17 2024Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
May 21 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2024.
May 21 2024Reply of petitioner Lonnie Bassett filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

NEAL.KATYAL@HOGANLOVELLS.COM
202 637 5528
Party name: Lonnie Bassett
Attorneys for Respondent
Alexander Westbrook Samuels
    Counsel of Record
Arizona Attorney General's Office
2005 N. Central Ave.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

ALEXANDER.SAMUELS@AZAG.GOV
602-542-5252
Party name: Arizona
Other
Elizabeth Graber Bentley
    Counsel of Record
Civil Rights Appellate Clinic
University of Minnesota Law School
229 19th Avenue South
Minneapolis, MN 55455

EBENTLEY@UMN.EDU
612-625-7809
Party name: Constitutional and Criminal Law Professors
Keith James Hilzendeger
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender, District of Arizona
850 West Adams Street
Suite 201
Phoenix, AZ 85007

KEITH_HILZENDEGER@FD.ORG
6023822781
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, Arizona Attorneys for Criminal Justice, Arizona Capital Representation Project, Arizona Justice Project, and the Federal Public Defender for the District of Arizona
Mikel Patrick Steinfeld
    Counsel of Record
Maricopa County Office of the Public Defender
620 W. Jackson, Suite 4015
Phoenix, AZ 85003

mikel.steinfeld@maricopa.gov
602-506-7711
Party name: Office of the Maricopa County Public Defender