No. 23-828
Title:Douglas B. Moylan, Attorney General of Guam, Petitioner
v.
Lourdes Leon Guerrero, Governor of Guam, et al.
Docketed:February 1, 2024
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Guam
   Case Numbers:(CRQ23-001)
   Decision Date:October 31, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 29 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 4, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 13 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 4, 2024 to April 3, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 23 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 3, 2024.
Feb 23 2024Waiver of right of respondent Lourdes A. Leon Guerrero, Governor of Guam to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 13 2024Motion of The Thirty-Seventh Guam Legislature to extend the time to file a response from April 3, 2024 to June 3, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 18 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including May 13, 2024.
Apr 19 2024Waiver of right of respondent The Thirty-Seventh Guam Legislature to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 30 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2024.
May 07 2024Response Requested. (Due June 6, 2024)
May 13 2024Motion of Lourdes Aflague Leon Guerrero to extend the time to file a response from June 6, 2024 to July 8, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 14 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 8, 2024, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Tyler Green
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
222 S. Main Street
5th Floor
Salt Lake City, UT 84101

TYLER@CONSOVOYMCCARTHY.COM
(703) 243-9423
Party name: Douglas B. Moylan, Attorney General of Guam
Attorneys for Respondents
Michael F. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Phillips & Bordallo, P.C.
410 West O'Brien Drive, Ste 102
Hagatna, GU 96910-5044

kotla671@yahoo.com
6717274190
Party name: The Thirty-Seventh Guam Legislature
Stephen I. Vladeck
    Counsel of Record
727 East Dean Keeton Street
Austin, TX 78705

SVLADECK@LAW.UTEXAS.EDU
5124759198
Party name: Lourdes A. Leon Guerrero, Governor of Guam
Leslie A. TravisOffice of the Governor of Guam
513 W. Marine Corps Drive
Hagatna, GU 96910

671-472-8931
Party name: Lourdes A. Leon Guerrero, Governor of Guam