No. 23-825
Title:Salvatore Delligatti, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:January 31, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2482, 18-2610)
   Decision Date:October 2, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:December 14, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 29 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 1, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 21 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 1, 2024 to April 1, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 22 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 1, 2024.
Feb 29 2024Brief amicus curiae of National Association for Public Defense filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 01 2024Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 1, 2024 to May 1, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 08 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 1, 2024.
May 01 2024Brief for the United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 03 2024Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
May 07 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/23/2024.
May 07 2024Reply of petitioner Salvatore Delligatti filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 28 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Allon Kedem
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

ALLON.KEDEM@ARNOLDPORTER.COM
2029425000
Party name: Salvatore Delligatti
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Alan Evan Schoenfeld
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale and Dorr, LLP
7 World Trade Center
250 Greenwich Street
New York, NY 10007

alan.schoenfeld@wilmerhale.com
(212) 230-8800
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Daniel Hirotsu Woofter
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein, Russell & Woofter LLC
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

DW@GOLDSTEINRUSSELL.COM
202-240-8433
Party name: National Association for Public Defense