No. 23-824
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
David L. Miller
Docketed:January 31, 2024
Linked with 23A445
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-4135)
   Decision Date:June 27, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:September 1, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 16 2023Application (23A445) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 30, 2023 to January 2, 2024, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 17 2023Application (23A445) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until January 2, 2024.
Dec 18 2023Application (23A445) to extend further the time from January 2, 2024 to January 29, 2024, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Written RequestProof of Service
Dec 19 2023Application (23A445) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until January 29, 2024.
Jan 29 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 1, 2024)
PetitionProof of Service
Feb 20 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 1, 2024 to April 1, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 21 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 1, 2024.
Mar 13 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 1, 2024 to May 13, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 14 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 13, 2024.
May 13 2024Brief of respondent David L. Miller in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 28 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2024.
May 28 2024Reply of United States submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondent
Lisa S. Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
680 Maine Avenue SW
Washington, DC 20024

LBLATT@WC.COM
202-434-5050
Party name: David L. Miller