No. 23-776
Title:Jeffrey B. Israelitt, Petitioner
v.
Enterprise Services LLC
Docketed:January 17, 2024
Linked with 23A442
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1382)
   Decision Date:August 16, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:September 12, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 09 2023Application (23A442) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 11, 2023 to January 13, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 16 2023Application (23A442) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 13, 2024.
Jan 12 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 16, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 16, 2024 to March 15, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 26 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 15, 2024.
Mar 14 2024Brief of respondent Enterprise Services, LLC in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 03 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/19/2024.
Apr 03 2024Reply of petitioner Jeffrey Israelitt filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Pamela Susan Karlan
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

karlan@stanford.edu
650-725-4851
Party name: Jeffrey Israelitt
Attorneys for Respondent
Heather Folsom Crow
    Counsel of Record
The Kullman Firm
2915 Kerry Forest Parkway, Suite 101
Tallahassee, FL 32309

hfc@kullmanlaw.com
2253156649
Party name: Enterprise Services, LLC
Allison A. FishThe Kullman Firm
1100 Poydras Street, Suite 1600
New Orleans, LA 70163

aaf@kullmanlaw.com
5045964108
Party name: Enterprise Services, LLC