No. 23-7730 | |
Title: | Thomas Richardson, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | June 14, 2024 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (22-3196) |
Decision Date: | January 25, 2024 |
Rehearing Denied: | February 27, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
May 22 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 15, 2024) |
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | |
Jun 21 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jun 27 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/30/2024. |
Oct 07 2024 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Thomas Richardson Counsel of Record | #11758424 FMC Butner - Unit 4D P.O. Box 1600 Butner, NC 27509-4600 | |
Party name: Thomas Richardson | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States |