No. 23-758 | |
Title: | Brian Chancey, Petitioner v. BASF Corporation |
Docketed: | January 12, 2024 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (23-40032) |
Decision Date: | October 10, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jan 08 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 12, 2024) |
PetitionAppendixProof of Service | |
Feb 09 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent BASF to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Feb 28 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2024. |
Mar 18 2024 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Brian Chancey Counsel of Record | 3117 Encino Avenue Bay City, TX 77414 | (832) 863-4519 |
Party name: Brian Chancey | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Ryan J. Swink Counsel of Record | Ogletree Deakins One Allen Center, 500 Dallas Street, Suite # 3000 Houston, TX 77002 Ryan.Swink@Ogletree.com | 713-655-5775 |
Party name: BASF |