No. 23-753
Title:City and County of San Francisco, California, Petitioner
v.
Environmental Protection Agency
Docketed:January 12, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-70282)
   Decision Date:July 31, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:October 10, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 08 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 12, 2024)
PetitionAppendixAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 12, 2024 to March 13, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 08 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 13, 2024
Feb 12 2024Brief amici curiae of National Mining Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 12 2024Brief amici curiae of Public Wastewater and Stormwater Agencies and Municipalities filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 01 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 13, 2024 to April 12, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 04 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 12, 2024
Apr 12 2024Brief of respondent Environmental Protection Agency in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 30 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2024.
Apr 30 2024Reply of petitioner City and County of San Francisco filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 08 2024Supplemental brief of petitioners City and County of San Francisco filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 20 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/23/2024.
May 28 2024Petition GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Christopher Silton
    Counsel of Record
Beveridge & Diamond, P.C.
1900 N Street NW
Suite 100
Washington, DC 20036

asilton@bdlaw.com
202-789-6078
Party name: City and County of San Francisco
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Other
David Yolun Chung
    Counsel of Record
Crowell & Moring, LLP
1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004-2595

dchung@crowell.com
202-624-2587
Party name: Public Wastewater and Stormwater Agencies and Municipalities
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
227 West Monroe Street
Suite 3900
Chicago, IL 60606

MISHA.TSEYTLIN@TROUTMAN.COM
608-999-1240
Party name: National Mining Association, et al.