No. 23-7517 | |
Title: | Christopher L. Wilson, Petitioner v. Hawaii |
Docketed: | May 21, 2024 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Hawaii |
Case Numbers: | (SCAP-22-0000561) |
Decision Date: | March 8, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
May 14 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 20, 2024) |
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | |
Jun 14 2024 | Amicus brief of National Association For Gun Rights submitted. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Benjamin Eleu Lowenthal Counsel of Record | The Office of the Public Defender State of Hawaii 1130 North Nimitz Highway, Suite A-254 Honolulu, HI 96817 benjamin.e.lowenthal@hawaii.gov | (808) 586-2080 |
Party name: Christopher Wilson | ||
Other | ||
Barry Kevin Arrington Counsel of Record | Arrington Law Firm 4195 Wadsworth Boulevard Wheat Ridge, CO 80033 BARRY@ARRINGTONPC.COM | 3032057870 |
Party name: National Association For Gun Rights |