No. 23-7490 | |
Title: | Chanel E. M. Nicholson, Petitioner v. W.L. York, Inc., dba Cover Girls, et al. |
Docketed: | May 16, 2024 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (23-20440) |
Decision Date: | March 4, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
May 10 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 17, 2024) |
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of ServiceAppendix | |
Jun 14 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent W.L. York, Inc., et al. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jun 20 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/30/2024. |
Sep 25 2024 | Response Requested. (Due October 25, 2024) |
Sep 30 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 25, 2024 to November 25, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Oct 01 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 25, 2024. |
Nov 07 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 25, 2024 to January 24, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Nov 08 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 24, 2025 (60-day extension). |
Nov 23 2024 | Letter from counsel for respondents received. |
Main Document | |
Jan 15 2025 | Brief of respondents W.L. York, Inc., et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jan 15 2025 | Corporate disclosure statement with respect to brief of respondents filed. |
Main Document | |
Jan 30 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2025. |
Feb 18 2025 | Rescheduled. |
Feb 24 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2025. |
Feb 25 2025 | Rescheduled. |
Mar 03 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/7/2025. |
Mar 03 2025 | Rescheduled. |
Mar 17 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/21/2025. |
Mar 19 2025 | Rescheduled. |
Mar 24 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/28/2025. |
Mar 26 2025 | Rescheduled. |
Mar 31 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/4/2025. |
Apr 01 2025 | Rescheduled. |
Apr 11 2025 | Reply of petitioner Chanel E.M. Nicholson filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 14 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2025. |
Apr 15 2025 | Rescheduled. |
Apr 21 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/25/2025. |
Apr 28 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/2/2025. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Andrew Timothy Tutt Counsel of Record | Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP 601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20001 ANDREW.TUTT@ARNOLDPORTER.COM | 202-942-5000 |
Party name: Chanel E.M. Nicholson | ||
Chanel E.M. Nicholson | 12331 North Gessner Road Houston, TX 77064 chanelellese@gmail.com | 713-885-1736 |
Party name: Chanel E.M. Nicholson | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Benjamin W. Allen Counsel of Record | Wallace & Allen, LLP 440 Louisiana, Suite 590 Houston, TX 77002 ballen@wallaceallen.com | 713-227-1744 |
Party name: W.L. York, Inc., et al. |