No. 23-743
Title:Consumers' Research, et al., Petitioners
v.
Federal Communications Commission, et al.
Docketed:January 9, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-13315)
   Decision Date:December 14, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 05 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 8, 2024)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 11 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 8, 2024 to March 4, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 12 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 4, 2024, for all respondents.
Feb 08 2024Brief amici curiae of West Virginia, 20 Other States, and the Arizona Legislature filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 12 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 4, 2024 to April 3, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 13 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 3, 2024, for all respondents.
Mar 11 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 3, 2024 to May 3, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 12 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 3, 2024, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
R. Trent McCotter
    Counsel of Record
Boyden Gray PLLC
801 17th Street, N.W.
Suite 350
Washington, DC 20006

tmccotter@boydengray.com
202-706-5488
Party name: Consumers' Research, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jason Edward Neal
    Counsel of Record
HWG LLP
1919 M Street NW
8th Floor
Washington, DC 20036

jneal@hwglaw.com
202-796-0994
Party name: Schools, Health & Libraries Broadband Coalition
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: FCC, et al.
Jennifer Beth Tatel
    Counsel of Record
Wilkinson Barker Knauer LLP
1800 M Street NW
Suite 800N
Washington, DC 20036

JTATEL@WBKLAW.COM
2023833344
Party name: USTelecom – The Broadband Association; National Telecommunications Cooperative Association d/b/a NTCA – The Rural Broadband Association; Competitive Carriers Association
Other
Andrew Jay Schwartzman
    Counsel of Record
Andrew Jay Schwartzman
525 Ninth Street NW
Seventh Floor
Washington, DC 20004

andyschwartzman@gmail.com
2022412408
Party name: Benton Institute for Broadband & Society, National Digital Inclusion Alliance, Center for Media Justice dba MediaJustice
Michael Ray Williams
    Counsel of Record
Office of the West Virginia Attorney General
State Capitol Complex, Bldg. 1, Rm E-26
1900 Kanawha Blvd. E
Charleston, WV 25305

michael.r.williams@wvago.gov
(304) 558-2021
Party name: State of West Virginia, 20 Other States, and the Arizona Legislature