No. 23-741
Vide 23-987
Title:Iftikar A. Ahmed, Petitioner
v.
Securities and Exchange Commission, et al.
Docketed:January 9, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1686, 21-1712)
   Decision Date:June 28, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:October 12, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 05 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 8, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 8, 2024 to March 11, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 08 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 11, 2024.
Feb 28 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 11, 2024 to April 10, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 29 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 10, 2024.
Apr 10 2024Brief of respondents SEC, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Vincent Gregory Levy
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg, LLP
750 Seventh Avenue, 26th Floor
New York, NY 10019

VLEVY@HSGLLP.COM
(646) 837-5120
Party name: Iftikar Ahmed
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: SEC, et al.