No. 23-726
Title:Mike Moyle, Speaker of the Idaho House of Representatives, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:January 5, 2024
Linked with 23A469
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-35450, 23-35440)
   Decision Date:November 13, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 20 2023Application (23A469) for a stay, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Nov 27 2023Response to application (23A469) requested by Justice Kagan, due by 3 p.m. (EST) on November 30, 2023.
Nov 30 2023Response to application from respondent United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 03 2024Supplemental Brief of applicants Mike Moyle, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jan 05 2024Application (23A469) referred to the Court.
Jan 05 2024Petition GRANTED.
Jan 05 2024Application (23A469) for stay presented to Justice Kagan and by her referred to the Court is granted. The preliminary injunction issued on August 24, 2022, by the United States District Court for the District of Idaho, case No. 1:22-cv-00329, is stayed. The application is also treated as a petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment, and the petition is granted (case No. 23-726) on the question presented in Idaho's application (23A470). The cases (23-726 and 23-727) are consolidated and a total of 1 hour is allotted for oral argument. The Clerk is directed to establish a briefing schedule that will allow the case to be argued in the April 2024 argument session. The stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. VIDED.
Jan 05 2024Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 23-726. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 23-726. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Jan 18 2024The joint appendix and petitioners’ briefs on the merits are to be filed on or before Tuesday, February 20, 2024. Respondent's brief on the merits is to be filed on or before Thursday, March 21, 2024. Reply briefs, if any, are to be filed with the Clerk and served upon opposing counsel on or before 2 p.m., Friday, April 12, 2024. VIDED.
Feb 16 2024SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, April 24, 2024. VIDED.
Feb 20 2024Brief of petitioners Mike Moyle, et al. (as to 23-726) filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 20 2024Brief of petitioner Idaho (as to 23-727) filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 20 2024Joint appendix (3 volumes) filed. VIDED. (Statement of cost received.)
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Feb 22 2024Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit.
Feb 23 2024Brief amici curiae of Foundation for Moral Law, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2024Brief amici curiae of Advancing American Freedom, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2024Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Faith and Family filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2024Record received from the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. The record is electronic and is available on PACER.
Feb 27 2024Brief amicus curiae of Manhattan Institute filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2024Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2024Brief amici curiae of United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2024Brief amici curiae of 121 Members of Congress filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2024Brief amicus curiae of National Right to Life Committee filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2024Brief amici curiae of States of Indiana and 21 other states filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2024Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 27 2024Brief amicus curiae of Christian Medical & Dental Associations filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2024Brief amici curiae of Woman Hurt by Abortion filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2024Brief amici curiae of Minnesota Family Council, Kansas Family Voice, and 24 Other Family Policy Organizations filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2024Brief amicus curiae of Charlotte Lozier Institute filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2024Brief amici curiae of America's Future, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2024Brief amicus curiae of Prolife Center at the University of St. Thomas filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2024Brief amicus curiae of The American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2024Brief amicus curiae of Stanton International (Mar. 6, 2024) filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2024Motion for divided argument filed by petitioners in No. 23-726. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 14 2024Brief amicus curiae of St. Luke’s Health System, Ltd. filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 18 2024Brief amici curiae of American Hospital Association, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 21 2024Brief of respondent United States filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 27 2024CIRCULATED
Mar 27 2024Brief amici curiae of U.S. Women's Chamber of Commerce, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 27 2024Brief amici curiae of Dr. Caitlin Bernard, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 27 2024Brief amicus curiae of National Network of Abortion Funds filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 27 2024Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2024Brief amicus curiae of Physicians for Reproductive Health filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2024Brief amici curiae of Pregnancy Justice, New York University School of Law Reproductive Justice Clinic, and If/When/How filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2024Brief amici curiae of Former HHS Officials filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2024Brief amici curiae of 258 Members of Congress filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2024Brief amici curiae of American Public Health Association, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2024Brief amicus curiae of Chicago Abortion Fund filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2024Brief amici curiae of Amanda Zurawski, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2024Brief amici curiae of Physicians for Human Rights filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2024Brief amici curiae of Local Prosecutors and Law Enforcement Leaders filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2024Brief amici curiae of American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Emergency Physicians, American Medical Association, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2024Brief amicus curiae of Idaho Coalition for Safe Healthcare, Inc. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2024Brief amici curiae of Professors Kent Greenfield, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2024Brief amici curiae of Sanctuary for Families and 16 Other Organizations filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2024Brief amici curiae of Professor David S. Cohen, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2024Brief amici curiae of Legal Scholars filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2024Brief amici curiae of National Women's Law Center, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 28 2024Brief amici curiae of Disability Rights Advocates and Scholars filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 28 2024Brief amici curiae of County Of Santa Clara and 12 Other Cities and Counties filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 28 2024Brief amici curiae of Amnesty International, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2024Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union and ACLU of Idaho filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 28 2024Brief amici curiae of States of California, New York, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 11 2024Reply of petitioners Mike Moyle, et al. filed (as to 23-726). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 12 2024Motion of petitioners in No. 23-726 for divided argument DENIED. VIDED.
Apr 12 2024Reply of petitioner Idaho filed (as to 23-727). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 24 2024Argued. For petitioners: Joshua N. Turner, Chief of Constitutional Litigation and Policy, Boise, Idaho. For respondent: Elizabeth B. Prelogar, Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Taylor Ann Rausch Meehan
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

TAYLOR@CONSOVOYMCCARTHY.COM
703-243-9423
Party name: Mike Moyle, et al.
Joshua Nathaniel Turner
    Counsel of Record
ldaho Attorney General's Office
700 W Jefferson Street
Boise, ID 83720

josh.turner@ag.idaho.gov
208-332-3548
Party name: Idaho
William C. Duncan1868 N 800 E
Lehi, UT 84043

billduncan56@gmail.com
(801)-367-4570
Party name: Mike Moyle, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Steven Henry Aden
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Life
1150 Connecticut Ave.
Suite 500
Washington, DC 22036

STEVEN.ADEN@AUL.ORG
202-741-4917
Party name: 121 Members of Congress
Thomas Richard Barker
    Counsel of Record
Foley Hoag, LLP
1717 K Street, NW
Washington, CA 20006

tbarker@foleyhoag.com
202-223-1200
Party name: American Public Health Association, Robert Wood Johnson Foundation, Network for Public Health Law, American Medical Women's Association, and 133 Deans and Scholars
James Allen Barta
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Indiana Attorney General
302 W. Washington Street
IGC South, Fifth Floor
Indianapolis, IN 46204

james.barta@atg.in.gov
317-232-0709
Party name: States of Indiana, Alabama, Alaska, Arkansas, Florida, Georgia, Iowa, Kansas, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, Montana, Nebraska, North Dakota, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, West Virginia, and Wyoming
James Bopp Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Bopp Law Firm, PC
The National Building
1 South Sixth Street
Terre Haute, IN 47807

jboppjr@aol.com
8122322434
Party name: National Right to Life Committee
Thomas L. Brejcha Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Thomas More Society
309 W. Washington Street
Suite 1250
Chicago, IL 60606

brejcha@aol.com
3127821680
Party name: United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, Catholic Health Care Leadership Alliance, Christ Medicus Foundation, National Catholic Bioethics Center, Catholic Bar Association, Catholic Medical Association & Catholic Benefits Association
Beth Susan Brinkmann
    Counsel of Record
Center for Reproductive Rights
1634 I Street NW Ste. 600
Washington, DC 20006

bbrinkmann@reprorights.org
(202) 628-0826
Party name: Amanda Zurawski, et al.
Brennan Tyler BrooksThomas More Society
309 W. Washington Street
Suite 1250
Chicago, IL 60606

btb@btylerbrookslawyer.com
336-707-8855
Party name: United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, Catholic Health Care Leadership Alliance, Christ Medicus Foundation, National Catholic Bioethics Center, Catholic Bar Association, Catholic Medical Association & Catholic Benefits Association
Mary Jane Browning
    Counsel of Record
The Justice Foundation
8023 Vantage Drive, Suite 1275
San Antonio, TX 78230

mbrowning@thejusticefoundation.org
1-210-614-7157
Party name: Woman Hurt by Abortion
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Counsel Group
1628 N Main St. #289
Salinas, CA 93906

ATCASO@CCG1776.COM
916-601-1916
Party name: Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
H. Rodgin Cohen
    Counsel of Record
Sullivan and Cromwell LLP
125 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004

cohenhr@sullcrom.com
212-558-3534
Party name: Pregnancy Justice, New York University School of Law Reproductive Justice Clinic, and If/When/How
Carolyn Frances Corwin
    Counsel of Record
Covington and Burling LLP
One City Center
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001-4956

ccorwin@cov.com
(202) 662-5338
Party name: Disability Rights Advocates and Scholars
Deborah Dewart
    Counsel of Record
111 Magnolia Lane
Hubert, NC 28539

LAWYERDEBORAH@OUTLOOK.COM
9103264554
Party name: Institute for Faith and Family
John Allen Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

eidsmoeja@juno.com
(334) 262-1245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law, The Lutheran Center for Religious Liberty, Lutherans for Life, and Two Kingdoms Ministry
John Patrick Elwood
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

JOHN.ELWOOD@ARNOLDPORTER.COM
(202) 942-5992
Party name: Legal Scholars
Susan J. Frietsche
    Counsel of Record
Women's Law Project
239 Fourth Avenue
Suite 2108
Pittsburgh, PA 15222

sfrietsche@womenslawproject.org
4122812892
Party name: Professor David S. Cohen, Professor Greer Donley, and Dean Rachel Rebouche
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

BRIANNE@THEUSCONSTITUTION.ORG
202 296 6889
Party name: 258 Members of Congress
Lindsay C. Harrison
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

LHARRISON@JENNER.COM
(202)-639-6000
Party name: St. Luke’s Health System, Ltd.
Christina Georgia Hioureas
    Counsel of Record
Foley Hoag LLP
1301 Avenue of the Americas
25th Floor
New York, NY 10019

chioureas@foleyhoag.com
212-812-0307
Party name: Amnesty International, Global Justice Center, Human Rights Watch, and The Ipas Impact Network
Nandan Maheshchandra Joshi
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20009

NJOSHI@CITIZEN.ORG
(202) 588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen
Alexa Kolbi-Molinas
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Federation
125 Broad Street, 18th Floor
New York, NY 10004

akolbi-molinas@aclu.org
(212) 549-2633
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union and ACLU of Idaho
Jamie Lee Lisagor
    Counsel of Record
Pacifica Law Group
1191 Second Avenue, Suite 2000
Seattle, WA 98101

jamie.lisagor@pacificalawgroup.com
(206)245-1700
Party name: National Network of Abortion Funds
Janice Marie Mac Avoy
    Counsel of Record
Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP
One New York Plaza
New York, NY 10004

JANICE.MACAVOY@FRIEDFRANK.COM
212-859-8182
Party name: Physicians for Reproductive Health
Christopher E. Mills
    Counsel of Record
Spero Law LLC
557 East Bay Street #22251
Charleston, SC 29413

cmills@spero.law
8436060640
Party name: Prolife Center at the University of St. Thomas
Emily Kanstroom Musgrave
    Counsel of Record
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky and Popeo, P.C
One Financial Center
Boston, MA 02111

EKMusgrave@mintz.com
(617) 542-6000
Party name: Professors Kent Greenfield, Adam Steinman, Julie C. Suk, and Joseph Thai
Rachel Amma Neil
    Counsel of Record
County Counsel, County of Santa Clara
70 West Hedding St., East Wing, 9th Floor
San Jose, CA 95110

rachel.neil@cco.sccgov.org
(408) 299-5900
Party name: County Of Santa Clara and 12 Other Cities and Counties
Nicholas J. Nelson
    Counsel of Record
CrossCastle PLLC
333 Washington Ave N., Ste 300-9078
Suite 470
Minneapolis, MN 55401

nicholas.nelson@crosscastle.com
612-429-8100
Party name: Minnesota Family Council, Kansas Family Voice, and 24 Other Family Policy Organizations
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

WJO@MINDSPRING.COM
7033565070
Party name: America's Future, Judicial Action Group, U.S. Constitutional Rights Legal Defense Fund, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, and Virginia Delegate Eric Zehr
Jennifer Kennedy Park
    Counsel of Record
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
1841 Page Mill Rd
Palo Alto, CA 94304

jkpark@cgsh.com
6508154130
Party name: Sanctuary for Families and 16 Other Organizations
Allan E. Parker Jr.The Justice Foundation
8023 Vantage Dr.
Suite 1275
San Antonio, TX 78230

aparker@txjf.org
2106147157
Party name: Women Hurt By Abortion
Skye Lynn Perryman
    Counsel of Record
Democracy Forward Foundation
PO Box 34553
Washington, DC 20043

sperryman@democracyforward.org
2024489090
Party name: American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Emergency Physicians, American Medical Association, et al.
Nicole A. Saharsky
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

NSAHARSKY@MAYERBROWN.COM
202-263-3000
Party name: Former HHS Officials
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

GSCHAERR@SCHAERR-JAFFE.COM
202-787-1060
Party name: Charlotte Lozier Institute
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
2025468890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Manhattan Institute
52 Vanderbilt Ave.
New York, NY 10017

ishapiro@manhattan-institute.org
212-599-7000
Party name: Manhattan Institute
Rupali Sharma
    Counsel of Record
Lawyering Project, A Project of the Tides Center
443 Western Ave. #1025
South Portland, ME 04106

RSHARMA@LAWYERINGPROJECT.ORG
(908) 930-6645
Party name: Dr. Caitlin Bernard, Dr. Lauren Miller, Dr. Leilah Zahedi-Spung, and Dr. Nikki Zite
Colleen Rosannah Smith
    Counsel of Record
Stris & Maher LLP
1717 K Street NW Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

csmith@stris.com
(213) 995-6800
Party name: Idaho Coalition for Safe Healthcare, Inc.
Gerson H. Smoger
    Counsel of Record
4228 Hallmark Drive
Dallas, TX 75229

smogerlaw@gmail.com
5105314529
Party name: Physicians for Human Rights
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Stone | Hilton PLLC
P.O. Box 150112
Austin, TX 78715

judd@stonehilton.com
(737) 465-7248
Party name: The American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists
Corey Lynn Stoughton
    Counsel of Record
Selendy Gay PLLC
1290 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10104

coreystoughton@yahoo.com
2123909000
Party name: Local Prosecutors and Law Enforcement Leaders
Charlotte Hemenway Taylor
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113

CTAYLOR@JONESDAY.COM
202-879-3872
Party name: American Hospital Association, the Association of American Medical Colleges, and America’s Essential Hospitals
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

BARBARA.UNDERWOOD@AG.NY.GOV
212-416-8016
Party name: States of California, New York, et al.
William Wagner
    Counsel of Record
Great Lakes Justice Center
5600 West Mount Hope Hwy
Lansing, MI 48917

PROF.WWJD@GMAIL.COM
517-643-1765
Party name: Stanton International
Christine E. Webber
    Counsel of Record
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC
1100 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20005

cwebber@cohenmilstein.com
2024084600
Party name: National Women's Law Center, et al.
John Marc Wheat
    Counsel of Record
Advancing American Freedom, Inc.
801 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 930
Washington, DC 20004-2729

MWHEAT@ADVANCINGAMERICANFREEDOM.COM
(202) 780-4848
Party name: Advancing American Freedom
Lori Halstead Windham
    Counsel of Record
Becket
1919 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20006

lwindham@becketlaw.org
202-349-7202
Party name: Christian Medical & Dental Associations
Alexander Michael Wolf
    Counsel of Record
Steptoe LLP
717 Texas Ave., Suite 2800
Houston, TX 77002

awolf@steptoe.com
7132212309
Party name: Chicago Abortion Fund
Michael Patrick Yingling
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith LLP
10 South Wacker Dr., 40th Fl.
Chicago, IL 60606

MPYINGLING@REEDSMITH.COM
312-207-2834
Party name: U.S. Women's Chamber of Commerce and Other Businesses