No. 23-722
Vide 23-842
Title:Ralph Diaz, et al., Petitioners
v.
Patricia Polanco, et al.
Docketed:January 4, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-15496)
   Decision Date:August 7, 2023
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:November 16, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 29 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 5, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 24 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 5, 2024 to March 6, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 26 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 6, 2024, for all respondents.
Feb 05 2024Waiver of right of respondents Donte Lee Harris, Kenneth Allan Cooper, and Matthew K. Quale, Jr. to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 28 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 6, 2024 to April 5, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 04 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 5, 2024.
Apr 05 2024Brief of respondents Patricia Polanco, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Teresa Alexandra Reed Dippo
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
455 Golden Gate Avenue
San Francisco, CA 94102

TERESA.REEDDIPPO@DOJ.CA.GOV
4155103896
Party name: Ralph Diaz, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Stanley R. Apps
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Stanley R. Apps
4424 Bellingham Avenue
Studio City, CA 91604

stan@appsatlaw.com
310-709-3966
Party name: Donte Lee Harris, Kenneth Allan Cooper, and Matthew K. Quale, Jr.
Paul Whitfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery
500 North Capitol Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

PHUGHES@MWE.COM
(202) 756-8981
Party name: Patricia Polanco, et al.