No. 23-720 | |
Title: | Omar Ahmed Khadr, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | January 4, 2024 |
Linked with 23A319 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-1218) |
Decision Date: | May 9, 2023 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 4, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Oct 09 2023 | Application (23A319) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 2, 2023 to January 1, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Oct 13 2023 | Application (23A319) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 1, 2024. |
Jan 02 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 5, 2024) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 23 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 5, 2024 to March 6, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jan 24 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 6, 2024. |
Feb 05 2024 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 01 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 6, 2024 to April 10, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 04 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 10, 2024. |
Apr 10 2024 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 29 2024 | Reply of Omar Ahmed Khadr submitted. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Juan Otoniel Perla Counsel of Record | Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle LLP 1717 Pennsylvania Ave NW Suite 1300 Washington, D.C. , NY 20006 JPERLA@CURTIS.COM | 202-452-7373 |
Party name: Omar Ahmed Khadr | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States | ||
Other | ||
Christine Saunders Haskett Counsel of Record | Covington & Burling LLP 415 Mission Street Suite 5400 San Francisco, CA 94105 chaskett@cov.com | 415-591-7087 |
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers |