No. 23-715 | |
Title: | Advocate Christ Medical Center, et al., Petitioners v. Xavier Becerra, Secretary of Health and Human Services |
Docketed: | January 3, 2024 |
Linked with 23A407 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (22-5214) |
Decision Date: | September 1, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 01 2023 | Application (23A407) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 30, 2023 to December 29, 2023, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Main DocumentOtherLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Nov 08 2023 | Application (23A407) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 29, 2023. |
Dec 29 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 2, 2024) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 04 2024 | Letter from counsel for petitioners pursuant to Rule 12.6 filed. |
Main Document | |
Jan 18 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 2, 2024 to March 4, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jan 19 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 4, 2024. |
Feb 02 2024 | Brief amici curiae of American Hospital Association, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 01 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 4, 2024 to April 18, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 04 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 18, 2024. |
Apr 18 2024 | Brief of respondent Xavier Becerra, Secretary of Health and Human Services in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Hyland Hunt Counsel of Record | Deutsch Hunt, PLLC 300 New Jersey Ave., NW Suite 900 Washington, DC 20001 HHUNT@DEUTSCHHUNT.COM | 2028686915 |
Party name: Advocate Christ Medical Center, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Becerra, Xavier | ||
Other | ||
Morgan Lee Ratner Counsel of Record | Sullivan & Cromwell LLP 1700 New York Avenue, N.W. Suite 700 Washington, DC 20006-5215 ratnerm@sullcrom.com | 202-956-7522 |
Party name: American Hospital Association, Association of American Medical Colleges, America's Essential Hospitals, Catholic Health Association, Federation of American Hospitals, National Rural Health Association |